This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/09/2020 at 11:50:13 (UTC).

ASC STAFFING, INC. VS DAY TO DAY IMPORTS INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/11/2019 ASC STAFFING, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAY TO DAY IMPORTS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMONA G. SEE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0142

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RAMONA G. SEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ASC STAFFING INC.

ACS STAFFING INC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PHARMEDOC INC.

TRULY COMMERCE INC.

DAY TO DAY IMPORTS INC

VIRGIN SCENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

MANALILI ANNE CLAIRE

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

KAUFMAN ARYEH

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO CCP SEC 664.6; (PROPOSED) ORDER THEREON

3/24/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO CCP SEC 664.6; (PROPOSED) ORDER THEREON

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/25/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

1/9/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement

1/9/2020: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL

1/24/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Order

7/8/2019: Case Management Order

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL PARTIAL

6/24/2019: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL PARTIAL

Answer - CROSS-DEFENDANT ACS STAFFING, INC.'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT DAY TO DAY IMPORTS, INC.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/7/2019: Answer - CROSS-DEFENDANT ACS STAFFING, INC.'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT DAY TO DAY IMPORTS, INC.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer - DEFENDANT DAY TO DAY IMPORTS, INC.'S ANSWER TO THE UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

5/6/2019: Answer - DEFENDANT DAY TO DAY IMPORTS, INC.'S ANSWER TO THE UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint - CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT DAY TO DAY IMPORTS, INC. AGAINST PLAINTIFF ACS STAFFING, INC.

5/6/2019: Cross-Complaint - CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT DAY TO DAY IMPORTS, INC. AGAINST PLAINTIFF ACS STAFFING, INC.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

3/13/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/27/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/20/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/11/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/11/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/11/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/11/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketStipulation for Dismissal of Complaint with Prejudice Pursuant to CCP Sec 664.6; (Proposed) Order Thereon; Filed by ACS Staffing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Ramona G. See, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial ((5 days)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Ramona G. See, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (- Partial); Filed by ACS Staffing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (as to the Cross-Complaint of Day to Day Imports, Inc.); Filed by Day to Day Imports Inc (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by ACS Staffing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Ramona G. See, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketDefendant Pharmedoc, Inc.'s Answer to the Unverified Complaint; Filed by Pharmedoc Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by ACS Staffing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by ACS Staffing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by ACS Staffing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ACS Staffing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ACS Staffing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ACS Staffing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ACS Staffing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pharmedoc Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where ACS STAFFING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where DAY TO DAY IMPORTS INC.; is a litigant

Latest cases where VIRGIN SCENT INC. is a litigant