Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2021 at 22:26:46 (UTC).

ASATOUR ARTHUR LALIKIAN VS CVS PHARMACY, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 ASATOUR ARTHUR LALIKIAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against CVS PHARMACY, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1254

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LALIKIAN ASATOUR ARTHUR

Defendants and Cross Defendants

WILLIAM GRANT & SONS INC.

YOUNG'S HOLDINGS INC.

CVS PHARMACY INC.

GLENFIDDICH HOLDINGS INC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

YOUNG'S HOLDINGS INC.

CVS PHARMACY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

VASQUEZ OLIVER

Cross Defendant Attorney

GREEN LISA

Other Attorneys

SAAKYAN ARMAN

 

Court Documents

Answer

5/14/2021: Answer

Request for Dismissal

3/29/2021: Request for Dismissal

Answer

3/19/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

2/22/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

2/22/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/22/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

2/17/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

1/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/12/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/13/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2024
  • Hearing01/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • Hearing07/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • Hearing06/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by William Grant & Sons, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Asatour Arthur Lalikian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by William Grant & Sons, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Defendant); Young's Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Defendant); Young's Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Defendant); Young's Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Defendant); Young's Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Asatour Arthur Lalikian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Asatour Arthur Lalikian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Asatour Arthur Lalikian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Asatour Arthur Lalikian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Asatour Arthur Lalikian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILLIAM GRANT & SONS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where YOUNG'S HOLDINGS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS Pharmacy, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAAKYAN ARMAN