This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2020 at 05:37:55 (UTC).

ASANGA, PADDY VS TAMKU, TAPANG IVO

Case Summary

On 11/05/2019 ASANGA, PADDY filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against TAMKU, TAPANG IVO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L, RIFF, LAWRENCE P. and CONVEY, MICHAEL J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1699

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L

RIFF, LAWRENCE P.

CONVEY, MICHAEL J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ASANGA PADDY

Respondent

TAMKU TAPANG IVO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

NSAHLAI EMMANUEL KONGNYUY

Respondent Attorneys

EDMONDSON JOSEPH CURTIS

SOHI JAYSON SINGH

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

11/5/2019: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

11/5/2019: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

11/5/2019: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Petition - Civil Harassment

11/5/2019: Petition - Civil Harassment

Response - Civil Harassment

11/25/2019: Response - Civil Harassment

Miscellaneous - Limited Appearance To Object To And To Quash The TRO, Brief In Opposition To The Motion For A TRO

11/25/2019: Miscellaneous - Limited Appearance To Object To And To Quash The TRO, Brief In Opposition To The Motion For A TRO

Miscellaneous - Limited Appearance To Object To And To Quash The TRO Proof Of Service

11/25/2019: Miscellaneous - Limited Appearance To Object To And To Quash The TRO Proof Of Service

Miscellaneous - Limited Appearance To Object To And To Quash The TRO

11/25/2019: Miscellaneous - Limited Appearance To Object To And To Quash The TRO

Minute Order

11/27/2019: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

11/27/2019: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Declaration of Due Diligence

12/2/2019: Declaration of Due Diligence

Declaration

1/14/2020: Declaration

Declaration

1/14/2020: Declaration

Request - Judicial Notice

1/14/2020: Request - Judicial Notice

Declaration

1/29/2020: Declaration

OSC - Re Contempt - RE: Petitioner Request for Order to Show Cause RE: Contempt Against Defendants

1/29/2020: OSC - Re Contempt - RE: Petitioner Request for Order to Show Cause RE: Contempt Against Defendants

Declaration

1/29/2020: Declaration

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketMail - Returned Mail (Attorney for Respondent )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 77, Convey, Michael J., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Denied - RO- After Evidence by both

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Riff, Lawrence P., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Transfer - Different Department- This Hearing Only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 77, Convey, Michael J., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Motion To Quash The TRO and Trial Brief, Proof of Service ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Trial Brief, Limited Appearance To Object To And To Quash The TRO, Defendant Ivo Tapang's Trial Brief In Opposition To Petitioner's Request For a Temporary Restraining Order (TRO); Declarations of J. Curtis Edmondson and Ivo Tapang ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Limited Appearance To Object To And To Quash The TRO ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketResponse - Civil Harassment; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Limited Appearance To Object To And To Quash The TRO Proof Of Service ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Limited Appearance To Object To And To Quash The TRO, Brief In Opposition To The Motion For A TRO ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (All Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less