This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2021 at 15:56:21 (UTC).

ARUTYUN H. ADZHEMYAN, ET AL. VS SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 ARUTYUN H ADZHEMYAN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANN I. JONES, ELIHU M. BERLE and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0052

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANN I. JONES

ELIHU M. BERLE

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

ADZHEMYAN ARUTYUN H.

Defendants and Appellants

SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA INC.

ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

YEREMIAN DAVID HARMIK

LINDSAY ALVIN BROCK

Defendant, Appellant and Respondent Attorneys

SHAVIT SHERRY B.

SPENCER NICHOLAS TRAMAINE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE STATUS OF APPEAL)

10/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE STATUS OF APPEAL)

Joint Status Conference Report

10/1/2021: Joint Status Conference Report

Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATEMENT

5/28/2021: Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE STATUS OF APPEAL)

6/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE STATUS OF APPEAL)

Notice of Ruling

6/17/2021: Notice of Ruling

Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript

4/6/2021: Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING FROM STATUS CONFERENCE

3/9/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING FROM STATUS CONFERENCE

Other - - JOINT STATEMENT

2/24/2021: Other - - JOINT STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Entry of Judgment

1/14/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULINGS FROM INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/19/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULINGS FROM INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

1/21/2021: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil)

1/22/2021: Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil)

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

1/27/2021: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

Answer - DEFENDANT SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES, USA, INC.'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/3/2020: Answer - DEFENDANT SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES, USA, INC.'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JANE HONG-ELSEY, CSR # 11975

11/3/2020: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JANE HONG-ELSEY, CSR # 11975

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

11/4/2020: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Other - - JOINT STATEMENT

10/26/2020: Other - - JOINT STATEMENT

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • Hearing02/10/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Status Conference (Re Status of Appeal) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re Status of Appeal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketJoint Status Conference Report; Filed by Securitas Security Services USA, Inc. (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketAppeal Record Delivered; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Securitas Security Services USA, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Status Conference (Re Status of Appeal) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re Status of Appeal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketJoint Statement; Filed by Arutyun H. Adzhemyan (Plaintiff); Securitas Security Services USA, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by Securitas Security Services USA, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Arutyun H. Adzhemyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • Docketat 10:55 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/17/2020, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Arutyun H. Adzhemyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Arutyun H. Adzhemyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YEREMIAN, DAVID

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LINDSAY ALVIN B.