This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2023 at 07:06:34 (UTC).

ARUN DEBNATH VS GERRY CRUZ

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 ARUN DEBNATH filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GERRY CRUZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9671

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEBNATH ARUN

Defendant

CRUZ GERRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WASKUL MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

SHEEDY CHRISTOPHER MADDEN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/16/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/16/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

6/16/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

6/16/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/16/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/16/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/16/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

7/18/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

8/17/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/17/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

8/17/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2024
  • Hearing06/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2023
  • Hearing12/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2023
  • Hearing11/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Gerry Cruz (Defendant); As to: Arun Debnath (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Gerry Cruz (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Gerry Cruz (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Arun Debnath (Plaintiff); As to: Gerry Cruz (Defendant); Service Date: 07/09/2022; Service Cost: 109.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Arun Debnath (Plaintiff); As to: Gerry Cruz (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Arun Debnath (Plaintiff); As to: Gerry Cruz (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Arun Debnath (Plaintiff); As to: Gerry Cruz (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WASKUL MICHAEL