This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/24/2021 at 10:13:22 (UTC).

ARTURO VALADEZ, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF OTHER AGGRIEVED EMPLOYEES VS CABINETS 2000, LLC., A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 ARTURO VALADEZ, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF OTHER AGGRIEVED EMPLOYEES filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CABINETS 2000, LLC , A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0026

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARTURO VALADEZ INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF OTHER AGGRIEVED EMPLOYEES

Defendant

CABINETS 2000 LLC. A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JIVALAGIAN CASPAR S

ADAMS CHRISTOPHER A

Defendant Attorney

HABIB JAWID

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/13/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/16/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

2/16/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

1/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/15/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/27/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

4/27/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/26/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

8/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

11/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

Request for Dismissal

11/18/2021: Request for Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ARTURO VALADEZ, individually and on behalf of other aggrieved employees (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • Docketat 09:47 AM in Department F; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Cabinets 2000, LLC., a limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by ARTURO VALADEZ, individually and on behalf of other aggrieved employees (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Cabinets 2000, LLC., a limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Cabinets 2000, LLC., a limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ARTURO VALADEZ, individually and on behalf of other aggrieved employees (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ARTURO VALADEZ, individually and on behalf of other aggrieved employees (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ARTURO VALADEZ, individually and on behalf of other aggrieved employees (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ARTURO VALADEZ, individually and on behalf of other aggrieved employees (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CABINETS 2000, INC is a litigant