This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2019 at 01:53:26 (UTC).

ARTURO SANCHEZ ET AL VS PUEBLAS RESTAURANT INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/08/2018 a Labor - Other Labor case was filed by ARTURO SANCHEZ against PUEBLAS RESTAURANT INC in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7241

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

VENEGAS MANUEL

SANCHEZ ARTURO

Respondents and Defendants

CASA TORRES

PUEBLOS RESTAURANT INC.

DOES 1-50

 

Court Documents

Notice

5/22/2018: Notice

Other -

5/22/2018: Other -

Minute Order

5/24/2018: Minute Order

Substitution of Attorney

8/17/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Other -

8/21/2018: Other -

Answer

8/22/2018: Answer

Minute Order

8/27/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/27/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/14/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/30/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order

2/27/2019: Minute Order

Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement

6/5/2019: Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement

Request for Judicial Notice

6/5/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration

6/6/2019: Declaration

Minute Order

4/17/2018: Minute Order

Complaint

4/12/2018: Complaint

SUMMONS

3/8/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. CLAIM FOR FAILURE TO PROVIDE MEAL BREAKS (IWC WAGE ORDERS 5, SECTION 11) ;ETC

3/8/2018: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. CLAIM FOR FAILURE TO PROVIDE MEAL BREAKS (IWC WAGE ORDERS 5, SECTION 11) ;ETC

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Declaration (of Armond M. Jackson in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement); Filed by Arturo Sanchez (Plaintiff); Manuel Venegas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Proof of Service; Filed by Arturo Sanchez (Plaintiff); Manuel Venegas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement); Filed by Arturo Sanchez (Plaintiff); Manuel Venegas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement (Class Action); Filed by Arturo Sanchez (Plaintiff); Manuel Venegas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by Arturo Sanchez (Plaintiff); Manuel Venegas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • at 1:45 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 6; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-04-17 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER (COMPLEX LITIGATION PROGRAM CLASS ACTIONS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Arturo Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Complaint -FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Arturo Sanchez (Plaintiff); Manuel Venegas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. CLAIM FOR FAILURE TO PROVIDE MEAL BREAKS (IWC WAGE ORDERS 5, SECTION 11) ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC697241    Hearing Date: February 03, 2020    Dept: 1

Final Approval of Class Action Settlement

Department SSC-1

Hon. Daniel Buckley

Sanchez v. Pueblas Restaurant Inc., et al.

Case Number: BC697241

Hearing Date: February 3, 2020

TENTATIVE RULING

Continue Final Approval for counsel to address the following:

1. The administrator did not provide a copy of the notice which was actually mailed out to class members. Exhibit A to Ms. Peternel’ s declaration is just another copy of her declaration.

2. Incentive Awards: No Declarations were filed for incentive awards from Plaintiffs Sanchez and Venegas. The Court cannot award incentive payments without declarations to support the requests.