This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/14/2023 at 04:58:25 (UTC).

ARTURO GARCIA, AN INDIVIDUAL VS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/13/2022 ARTURO GARCIA, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1012

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA AN INDIVIDUAL ARTURO

Defendant

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FALER MATTHEW

Defendant Attorney

INGOLD TREVOR J.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE

12/13/2022: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE

Complaint

12/13/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/13/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

12/13/2022: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/13/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/14/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/14/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

12/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

1/18/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2023
  • Hearing05/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • Hearing03/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC Erroneously Sued As American Honda Motor Company (Defendant); As to: Arturo Garcia, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Arturo Garcia, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Company (Defendant); Service Date: 12/19/2022; Service Cost: 34.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David A. Rosen in Department E Glendale Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Arturo Garcia, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: Arturo Garcia, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketAffidavit of Venue; Filed by: Arturo Garcia, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Arturo Garcia, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Arturo Garcia, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less