This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2021 at 06:06:59 (UTC).

ARTURO ALARCON VS THE WORLD AT YOUR DOORSTEP, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 ARTURO ALARCON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against THE WORLD AT YOUR DOORSTEP, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THERESA M. TRABER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5799

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THERESA M. TRABER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALARCON ARTURO

Defendants

PLAYA VISTA CIRCULATION INC.

WORLD AT YOUR DOORSTEP INC.

PLAYA VISTA CIRCULATION

WORLD AT YOUR DOORSTEP

THE WORLD AT YOUR DOORSTEP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EBRAHIMIAN N. NICK

Defendant Attorneys

CASS PAUL LEONARD

CASS PAUL

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

9/15/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/15/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/9/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

8/9/2021: Answer

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING PLAINTIFF ARTURO ALARCONS NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS OF THE COURTS JULY 27, 2021 MINUTE ORDER

7/27/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING PLAINTIFF ARTURO ALARCONS NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS OF THE COURTS JULY 27, 2021 MINUTE ORDER

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

7/27/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/12/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/12/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/12/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/12/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/12/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/24/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/24/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/24/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/10/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/27/2021: Complaint

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • Hearing10/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by THE WORLD AT YOUR DOORSTEP, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by ARTURO ALARCON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by THE WORLD AT YOUR DOORSTEP, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by THE WORLD AT YOUR DOORSTEP, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47, Theresa M. Traber, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:59 AM in Department 47, Theresa M. Traber, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (PLAINTIFF ARTURO ALARCON?S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS OF THE COURT?S JULY 27, 2021 MINUTE ORDER); Filed by ARTURO ALARCON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ARTURO ALARCON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ARTURO ALARCON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ARTURO ALARCON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ARTURO ALARCON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ARTURO ALARCON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ARTURO ALARCON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ARTURO ALARCON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ARTURO ALARCON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EBRAHIMIAN N. NICK ESQ.