This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/26/2023 at 14:44:29 (UTC).

ARTUR SEKOYAN VS LEVON ZOGRABIAN

Case Summary

On 10/17/2022 ARTUR SEKOYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LEVON ZOGRABIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID A. ROSEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0709

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID A. ROSEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEKOYAN ARTUR

Defendant

ZOGRABIAN LEVON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KHACHATRIAN ARTHUR

SOGOYAN JACK

Defendant Attorneys

MAHLSTEDT BRADLEY VERNON

GALLARZO KEITH F.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/17/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/17/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/17/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/17/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

10/17/2022: Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/25/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Demand for Jury Trial

11/23/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

11/23/2022: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

1/11/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/7/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

2/7/2023: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/3/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

3/3/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/3/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/20/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2024
  • Hearing02/13/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2024
  • Hearing02/01/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2024
  • Hearing01/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 01/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/01/2024 at 09:00 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketJury Trial time est. 4 days scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 09:00 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E updated: Result Date to 03/20/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Artur Sekoyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Artur Sekoyan (Plaintiff); As to: Levon Zograbian (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Artur Sekoyan (Plaintiff); As to: Levon Zograbian (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/24/2022; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Artur Sekoyan (Plaintiff); As to: Levon Zograbian (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Artur Sekoyan (Plaintiff); As to: Levon Zograbian (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Artur Sekoyan (Plaintiff); As to: Levon Zograbian (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David A. Rosen in Department E Glendale Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less