This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2023 at 00:35:30 (UTC).

ARTUR GRIGORYAN VS JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 ARTUR GRIGORYAN filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0843

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRIGORYAN ARTUR

Defendants

JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

JAGUAR VAN NUYS/LAND ROVER VAN NUYS A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAYLOR NORMAN F.

Defendant Attorney

WOLF MATTHEW C.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/23/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/23/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/23/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/23/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/23/2023: Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/22/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/7/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

4/10/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2023
  • Hearing06/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Galpin Jaguar Lincoln-Mercury Inc. Erroneously Sued As Jaguar Van Nuys/Land Rover Van Nuys, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant); As to: Artur Grigoryan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Artur Grigoryan (Plaintiff); As to: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Service Date: 03/09/2023; Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Artur Grigoryan (Plaintiff); As to: Jaguar Van Nuys/Land Rover Van Nuys, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/17/2023; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Artur Grigoryan (Plaintiff); As to: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Jaguar Van Nuys/Land Rover Van Nuys, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Artur Grigoryan (Plaintiff); As to: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Jaguar Van Nuys/Land Rover Van Nuys, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Artur Grigoryan (Plaintiff); As to: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Jaguar Van Nuys/Land Rover Van Nuys, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Valerie Salkin in Department U Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less