This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/10/2023 at 13:06:43 (UTC).

ARTHUR Y WADA VS TRI PACIFIC TERMITE COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/17/2017 ARTHUR Y WADA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TRI PACIFIC TERMITE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT, DAVID J. COWAN, LAURA A. SEIGLE, EDWARD B. MORETON, JR., THERESA M. TRABER, MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT, SAMANTHA JESSNER, YOLANDA OROZCO and JILL FEENEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4510

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

DAVID J. COWAN

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.

THERESA M. TRABER

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

SAMANTHA JESSNER

YOLANDA OROZCO

JILL FEENEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HURTADO GEORGE

Defendants

MCCAULEY JOHN

CORVINO CARLO

TRI-PACIFIC TERMITE COMPANY

JOHN MCCAULEY DOING BUSINESS AS TRI-PACIFIC TERMITE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN ROBERT ANTHONY

Defendant Attorney

DAVIS ERIN MARIE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

3/3/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

3/3/2023: Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

3/3/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

Witness List - WITNESS LIST PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST

3/1/2023: Witness List - WITNESS LIST PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

3/1/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS DEFENDANTS' AMENDED [ PROPOSED ] LIST OF

2/28/2023: Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS DEFENDANTS' AMENDED [ PROPOSED ] LIST OF

Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST DEFENDANTS'

2/27/2023: Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST DEFENDANTS'

Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS DEFENDANTS' [ PROPOSED ] LIST OF

2/27/2023: Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS DEFENDANTS' [ PROPOSED ] LIST OF

Witness List - WITNESS LIST DEFENDANTS'

2/27/2023: Witness List - WITNESS LIST DEFENDANTS'

Trial Brief - TRIAL BRIEF DEFENDANTS'

2/27/2023: Trial Brief - TRIAL BRIEF DEFENDANTS'

Statement of the Case - STATEMENT OF THE CASE DEFENDANTS TRI - PACIFIC TERMITE COMPANY, JOHN MCCAULEY, INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS TRI - PACIFIC

2/27/2023: Statement of the Case - STATEMENT OF THE CASE DEFENDANTS TRI - PACIFIC TERMITE COMPANY, JOHN MCCAULEY, INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS TRI - PACIFIC

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER TRIAL ASSIGNMENT AND LONG CAUSE READINESS)

12/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER TRIAL ASSIGNMENT AND LONG CAUSE READINESS)

Trial Brief - PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL BRIEF

12/5/2022: Trial Brief - PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL BRIEF

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/5/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

12/5/2022: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF LONG CAUSE SUBMISSION TO DEPARTMENT 1

12/2/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF LONG CAUSE SUBMISSION TO DEPARTMENT 1

Witness List - JOINT LIST OF WITNESS AT TRIAL

12/2/2022: Witness List - JOINT LIST OF WITNESS AT TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER THAT THE FIVE YEAR ...)

12/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER THAT THE FIVE YEAR ...)

154 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2023
  • Hearing08/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 08/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Signed and Filed by: Carlo Corvino (Defendant); John McCauley (Defendant); Tri-Pacific Termite Company (Defendant); John McCauley doing business as Tri-Pacific Termite Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 03/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 03/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 03/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketWitness List Plaintiff's Witness List; Filed by: Arthur Y. Wada (Plaintiff); George Hurtado (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Jury Trial scheduled for 03/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 03/03/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
321 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketDocument:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketDocument:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketDocument:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketDocument:Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketDocument:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Final Status Conference 01/08/19 at 10:00 am Yolanda Orozco

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Jury Trial 01/17/19 at 8:30 am Yolanda Orozco

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:OSC RE Dismissal 03/17/20 at 8:30 am Holly J. Fujie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****4510 Hearing Date: August 12, 2022 Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

ARTHUR Y. WADA,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

TRI PACIFIC TERMITE COMPANY, et al.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO.: ****4510

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS TRI-PACIFIC TERMITE COMPANY, JOHN MCCAULEY, AND CARLO COVINO’S MOTION TO BIFURCATE

Dept. 27

1:30 p.m.

August 12, 2022

Under the Personal Injury Court system, this case will be tried by a Court other than the instant Court. The trial Court rules on motions in limine and motions to bifurcate. Defendants’ Motion is similarly a motion which should be ruled on by the judge who will preside over trial in this matter. Thus, Defendants’ motion is denied without prejudice.

Defendants are instructed to renew this Motion with the trial judge.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. Please be advised that if you submit on the tentative and elect not to appear at the hearing, the opposing party may nevertheless appear at the hearing and argue the matter. Unless you receive a submission from all other parties in the matter, you should assume that others might appear at the hearing to argue. If the Court does not receive emails from the parties indicating submission on this tentative ruling and there are no appearances at the hearing, the Court may, at its discretion, adopt the tentative as the final order or place the motion off calendar.



Case Number: ****4510    Hearing Date: April 13, 2021    Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA 

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

ARTHUR Y. WADA,

Plaintiff,

vs.

TRI PACIFIC TERMITE COMPANY, et al.

Defendants.

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

.: ****4510

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

Dept. 27

8:30 a.m.

April 13, 2021

On March 17, 2017, Plaintiff Arthur Y. Wada (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Defendants Tri-Pacific Termite Company, John McCauley, and Carlo Covino (collectively, “Defendants”) arising from a March 17, 2015 motor vehicle v. bicycle collision.

On August 4, 2020, Defendants served Requests for Admissions, Set Two; Form Interrogatories, Set Two; Special Interrogatories, Set Two; and Requests for Production of Documents, Set Two.  On August 17, 2020, Plaintiff served objections.  On October 1, 2020, Defendants filed these Motions to compel and deem admitted. 

Defendants moves to compel Plaintiff’s responses and deem admitted on the grounds that no verified responses have been received.  However, objections do not need to be verified as they are distinct from discovery responses.  (See, e.g., Code Civ. Proc., ; 2030.250.)  A response composed solely of objections, as in this case, need not be verified by the party. (Blue Ride Ins. Co. v. Superior Court (19988) 202 Cal.App.3d 339, 344-345.)  Accordingly, Defendants’ Motions are DENIED.  To the extent Defendants challenge the validity of Plaintiff’s objections, these motions are to be construed as motions to compel a further response, which are premature as the parties have not participated in an Informal Discovery Conference as required by the Court’s First Amended Standing Order Re: PI Court Procedures (2/24/2020). 

Accordingly, the hearings are taken off-calendar until Defendants schedule and attend an IDC.  If the issues are not resolved at the IDC, Defendants may re-file the Motions and indicate that they were previously filed within the time to bring a motion to compel a further response.   

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  

Dated this 13th day of April 2021

Hon. Edward B. Moreton, Jr.

Judge of the Superior Court