This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/14/2023 at 09:54:42 (UTC).

ARTHUR LOPEZ VS THE CATHEDRAL OF OUR LADY OF THE ANGELS A CORPORATION SOLE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 ARTHUR LOPEZ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against THE CATHEDRAL OF OUR LADY OF THE ANGELS A CORPORATION SOLE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0142

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

LOPEZ ARTHUR

Respondents and Defendants

THE CATHEDRAL OF OUR LADY OF THE ANGELS A CORPORATION SOLE

THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BIR DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/13/2023

3/13/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/13/2023

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION REQUESTING AN ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO FURNISH SECURITY OR OTHERWISE AN ORDER DISMISSING THE LITIGATION

3/9/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION REQUESTING AN ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO FURNISH SECURITY OR OTHERWISE AN ORDER DISMISSING THE LITIGATION

Motion to Declare Vexatious Litigant

3/9/2023: Motion to Declare Vexatious Litigant

Request for Judicial Notice

3/9/2023: Request for Judicial Notice

Request - REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION

2/21/2023: Request - REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/21/2023

2/21/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/21/2023

Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ADA ACCOMMODATION REQUEST DENIAL ORDER OF FEBRUARY 2ND, 2022

2/21/2023: Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ADA ACCOMMODATION REQUEST DENIAL ORDER OF FEBRUARY 2ND, 2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/21/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

2/17/2023: Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

Request - REQUEST . FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ADA REQ DENIAL ORDER OF 2/2/23

2/14/2023: Request - REQUEST . FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ADA REQ DENIAL ORDER OF 2/2/23

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - APPEAL - NOTICE OF APPEAL/CROSS APPEAL FILED NO PROOF OF SERVICE

2/10/2023: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - APPEAL - NOTICE OF APPEAL/CROSS APPEAL FILED NO PROOF OF SERVICE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR REQUEST FOR ACCOMMODATIONS BY PERSONS WITH DISABILITIES AND RESPONSE

2/2/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR REQUEST FOR ACCOMMODATIONS BY PERSONS WITH DISABILITIES AND RESPONSE

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT

1/6/2023: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

1/6/2023: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/05/2023

1/5/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/05/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/5/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 425.16

12/22/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 425.16

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2023
  • Hearing06/06/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • Hearing06/06/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • Hearing06/06/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Declare Vexatious Litigant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • Hearing06/06/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • Hearing06/06/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • Hearing06/06/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Declare Vexatious Litigant scheduled for 06/06/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Reconsideration scheduled for 06/06/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/13/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Arthur Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: The Cathedral of Our Lady of the Angels a corporation sole (Defendant); The Roman Catholic ArchBishop of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Arthur Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Arthur Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael L. Stern in Department 62 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less