Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/19/2020 at 03:57:37 (UTC).

ARTHUR DANIELS, JR. VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SOCIAL SERVICES

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 ARTHUR DANIELS, JR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SOCIAL SERVICES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6429

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANIELS JR. ARTHUR

Defendant

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SOCIAL SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BATH JASMINE

 

Court Documents

Answer

6/2/2020: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/8/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/15/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/29/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2023
  • Hearing04/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • Hearing10/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • Hearing10/13/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by County of Los Angeles Department of Public Social Services (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by County of Los Angeles Department of Public Social Services (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Arthur Daniels, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Arthur Daniels, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Arthur Daniels, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCV16429    Hearing Date: December 02, 2020    Dept: 29

Daniels, Jr.  v. County of Los Angeles Department of Public Social Services

Referral of Personal Injury (PI) Action to Department 1 for Review/Reassignment;

The Court having reviewed the legal file determines that the above entitled-action was erroneously filed as a Personal Injury ("PI") matter.

The Court orders this action referred to the Master Calendar Department, Department 1 for review and determination as to whether this case should or should not be reassigned to an Independent Calendar ("IC") Court.

On the Court's own motion, the Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (CCP 438(c) Filed by Defendant scheduled for 12/02/2020 is advanced to this date and vacated , subject to being reset and notified Re: new hearing date by the receiving court at the direction of Department 1.

(NOTE: ALL HEARINGS currently set in Department 29 of the Spring Street Courthouse are taken off calendar subject to being reset and notified by the receiving court, at the direction of Department 1, Re: New hearing dates.)

Judicial Assistant is directed to give notice to Plaintiff, who upon receipt of this notice, is ordered to give notice to all Parties of record.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BATH JASMINE K. DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL