This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/05/2023 at 09:09:19 (UTC).

P. VS ACCIDENT FIGHTERS, APC, A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/24/2022 filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against ACCIDENT FIGHTERS, APC, A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RUPERT A. BYRDSONG and HOLLY J. FUJIE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0231

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

HOLLY J. FUJIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

.

Defendants

ACCIDENT FIGHTERS APC A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

LERNER LAW FIRM PC A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

LERNER NEER

ZEESMAN ALEXANDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAPLAN JEROME ALAN

Defendant Attorney

FELDMAN KENNETH CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 425.16

1/24/2023: Order - ORDER OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 425.16

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE UNDER CCP SECTION 425.16 ...)

12/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE UNDER CCP SECTION 425.16 ...)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE BY: FELIPE CARRILLO, CSR# 9555

12/15/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE BY: FELIPE CARRILLO, CSR# 9555

Objection - OBJECTION TO SUR REPLY

12/12/2022: Objection - OBJECTION TO SUR REPLY

Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S SUR REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 425.16; DECLARATION OF

12/8/2022: Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S SUR REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 425.16; DECLARATION OF

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO CODE CIV. PROC. 425.16

12/8/2022: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO CODE CIV. PROC. 425.16

Request - REQUEST REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION AND THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

12/2/2022: Request - REQUEST REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION AND THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 425.16

12/2/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 425.16

Proof of Personal Service

4/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

4/11/2022: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

4/11/2022: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 04/18/2022

4/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 04/18/2022

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/18/2022

4/18/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/18/2022

Request for Judicial Notice

5/31/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

5/31/2022: Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

Notice - NOTICE COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO CODE CIV. PROC. 425.16

5/31/2022: Notice - NOTICE COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO CODE CIV. PROC. 425.16

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALEXANDER J. ZEESMAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO CODE CIV. PROC. 425.16; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

5/31/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALEXANDER J. ZEESMAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO CODE CIV. PROC. 425.16; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Status of Attorneys Fees and Order/Judgment scheduled for 03/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 01/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketOrder OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 425.16; Signed and Filed by: Accident Fighters, APC, a California professional corporation (Defendant); Alexander Zeesman (Defendant); Lerner Law Firm PC, a California professional corporation (Defendant); Neer Lerner (Defendant); As to: P. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Order OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 425.16: Filed By: Accident Fighters, APC, a California professional corporation (Defendant),Lerner Law Firm PC, a California professional corporation (Defendant),Neer Lerner (Defendant),Alexander Zeesman (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 01/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion): Filed By: Lerner Law Firm PC, a California professional corporation (Defendant),Accident Fighters, APC, a California professional corporation (Defendant),Alexander Zeesman (Defendant),Neer Lerner (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 12/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Status of Attorneys Fees and Order/Judgment scheduled for 03/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore By: Felipe Carrillo, CSR# 9555; Filed by: Accident Fighters, APC, a California professional corporation (Defendant); Alexander Zeesman (Defendant); Lerner Law Firm PC, a California professional corporation (Defendant); Neer Lerner (Defendant); As to: Accident Fighters, APC, a California professional corporation (Defendant); Alexander Zeesman (Defendant); Lerner Law Firm PC, a California professional corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketHearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion) scheduled for 12/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28 updated: Result Date to 12/15/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 12/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketObjection to Sur Reply; Filed by: Accident Fighters, APC, a California professional corporation (Defendant); Alexander Zeesman (Defendant); Lerner Law Firm PC, a California professional corporation (Defendant); Neer Lerner (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketAddress for Jerome Alan Kaplan (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: P. (Plaintiff); As to: Accident Fighters, APC, a California professional corporation (Defendant); Alexander Zeesman (Defendant); Lerner Law Firm PC, a California professional corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: P. (Plaintiff); As to: Accident Fighters, APC, a California professional corporation (Defendant); Alexander Zeesman (Defendant); Lerner Law Firm PC, a California professional corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: P. (Plaintiff); As to: Accident Fighters, APC, a California professional corporation (Defendant); Alexander Zeesman (Defendant); Lerner Law Firm PC, a California professional corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
Please note that some of the information in this case has been redacted.