This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/25/2023 at 00:01:48 (UTC).

ARSEN MANGASARIAN, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 ARSEN MANGASARIAN, AN INDIVIDUAL, filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID A. ROSEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1058

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID A. ROSEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MANGASARIAN AN INDIVIDUAL ARSEN

MANGASARIAN AN INDIVIDUAL CAROLINE

Defendants

MERCEDES-BENZ OF ARCADIA A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

MERCEDES-BENZ USA LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TAYLOR NORMAN F.

ROTMAN AMY

Defendant Attorney

ROBINETT TIMOTHY D.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/19/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/19/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/19/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/19/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

12/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/4/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Motion to Compel Arbitration

1/23/2023: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Request for Judicial Notice

1/23/2023: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ALI AMERIPOUR IN SUPPORT

1/23/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ALI AMERIPOUR IN SUPPORT

Association of Attorney

1/31/2023: Association of Attorney

Answer

2/7/2023: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

3/22/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2023
  • Hearing06/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • Hearing05/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E updated: Result Date to 03/22/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Mercedes-Benz of Arcadia, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant); As to: Arsen Mangasarian, an individual (Plaintiff); Caroline Mangasarian, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by: Arsen Mangasarian, an individual (Plaintiff); Caroline Mangasarian, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); As to: Arsen Mangasarian, an individual (Plaintiff); Caroline Mangasarian, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Ali Ameripour in support; Filed by: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David A. Rosen in Department E Glendale Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Arsen Mangasarian, an individual (Plaintiff); Caroline Mangasarian, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Mercedes-Benz of Arcadia, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Arsen Mangasarian, an individual (Plaintiff); Caroline Mangasarian, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Mercedes-Benz of Arcadia, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Arsen Mangasarian, an individual (Plaintiff); Caroline Mangasarian, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Mercedes-Benz of Arcadia, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less