This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/29/2023 at 08:52:42 (UTC).

ARSEN AVAGYAN VS SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 ARSEN AVAGYAN filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FRANK M. TAVELMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0648

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

FRANK M. TAVELMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVAGYAN ARSEN

Defendant

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BELORYAN HAIK

Defendant Attorney

BOOS NICHOLAS JUSTIN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/12/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/12/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/12/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/12/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/12/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE SUMMONS

9/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE SUMMONS

Answer

10/17/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

1/25/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/30/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/30/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/9/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

3/16/2023: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2023
  • Hearing08/09/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Removal to Federal Court: Filed By: Safeco Insurance Company of America (Defendant); Result: Reviewed ; Result Date: 03/21/2023 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by: Safeco Insurance Company of America (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference re: Mediation scheduled for 08/09/2023 at 09:00 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 02/09/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Arsen Avagyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Arsen Avagyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Safeco Insurance Company of America (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service Summons; Filed by: Arsen Avagyan (Plaintiff); As to: Safeco Insurance Company of America (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Arsen Avagyan (Plaintiff); As to: Safeco Insurance Company of America (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Arsen Avagyan (Plaintiff); As to: Safeco Insurance Company of America (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Arsen Avagyan (Plaintiff); As to: Safeco Insurance Company of America (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Frank M. Tavelman in Department A Burbank Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less