This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/09/2021 at 02:14:49 (UTC).

ARROWTAIL, LLC VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY ASSESSMENT APPEALS BOARD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 ARROWTAIL, LLC filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY ASSESSMENT APPEALS BOARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID J. COWAN and ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0246

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID J. COWAN

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ARROWTAIL LLC

Respondent

LOS ANGELES COUNTY ASSESSMENT APPEALS BOARD

Interested Parties

LOS ANGELES COUNTY BOARD OF SUPERVISORS

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

POOL ROBERT A.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition - VERIFIED PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE

1/28/2021: Petition - VERIFIED PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

2/4/2021: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO WRITS AND RECEIVERS COURT) OF 02/03/2021

2/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO WRITS AND RECEIVERS COURT) OF 02/03/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO WRITS AND RECEIVERS COURT)

2/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO WRITS AND RECEIVERS COURT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/02/2021

2/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/02/2021

Request for Dismissal

5/5/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 86; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Arrowtail, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:37 AM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to Writs and Receivers Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to Writs and Receivers Court) of 02/03/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • Docketat 1:02 PM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/02/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketVerified Petition for Peremptory Writ of Mandate; Filed by Arrowtail, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Arrowtail, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARROWTAIL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POOL, ROBERT A.