This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2020 at 01:57:11 (UTC).

ARROWTAIL, LLC VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY ASSESSMENT APPEALS BOARD

Case Summary

On 02/21/2020 ARROWTAIL, LLC filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY ASSESSMENT APPEALS BOARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0747

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ARROWTAIL LLC

Respondent

LOS ANGELES COUNTY ASSESSMENT APPEALS BOARD

Interested Parties

LOS ANGELES COUNTY BOARD OF SUPERVISORS

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party, Respondent and Petitioner Attorneys

POOL ROBERT

SLATTERY MICHAEL KEVIN

WICKHAM MARY CONWAY

 

Court Documents

Petition for Writ of Mandate

2/21/2020: Petition for Writ of Mandate

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

2/27/2020: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/27/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PERSONAL SERVICE ON REAL PARTIES IN INTEREST

3/16/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PERSONAL SERVICE ON REAL PARTIES IN INTEREST

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT

3/16/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT

Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

3/16/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

Answer

3/25/2020: Answer

Notice of Related Case

4/10/2020: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Status Conference and Order

4/24/2020: Notice of Status Conference and Order

Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

5/4/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/30/2020

4/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/30/2020

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

5/8/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: RELATED CASES WITH 19STCP04277)

8/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: RELATED CASES WITH 19STCP04277)

Notice - NOTICE RE APPEARANCE BY LACOURTCONNECT

7/29/2020: Notice - NOTICE RE APPEARANCE BY LACOURTCONNECT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Status Conference (ReRelated Cases with 19STCP04277) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Related Cases with 19STCP04277)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNotice (Re Appearance by LACourtConnect); Filed by Arrowtail, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 86; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance of Trial Setting Conference); Filed by Arrowtail, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Status Conference and Order); Filed by Arrowtail, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 86; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/30/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Arrowtail, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Los Angeles County Assessment Appeals Board (Respondent); Los Angeles County Board of Supervisors (Real Party in Interest); County of Los Angeles (Real Party in Interest)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketNotice ( of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon); Filed by Arrowtail, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Personal Service on Real Parties in Interest); Filed by Arrowtail, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Personal Service on Respondent); Filed by Arrowtail, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Arrowtail, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate; Filed by Arrowtail, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARROWTAIL LLC is a litigant