This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2020 at 19:13:46 (UTC).

ARRINGTON-WHITE, KIRI VS WHITE, WILLIAM H., III

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 ARRINGTON-WHITE, KIRI filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against WHITE, WILLIAM H , III. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0100

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ARRINGTON-WHITE KIRI

Respondent

WHITE WILLIAM H. III

 

Court Documents

Petition - Legal Separation w/o Minor Child

2/13/2020: Petition - Legal Separation w/o Minor Child

Declaration - Separate Property

2/13/2020: Declaration - Separate Property

Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

2/13/2020: Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

2/13/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Summons

2/13/2020: Summons

Proof of Service of Summons

2/27/2020: Proof of Service of Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Separate Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPetition - Legal Separation w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.