Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/17/2021 at 21:27:46 (UTC).

ARREOLA, DAVID VS DIAZ, PASTORA

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 ARREOLA, DAVID filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against DIAZ, PASTORA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TITUS, PATRICIA J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0072

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TITUS, PATRICIA J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ARREOLA DAVID

Respondent

DIAZ PASTORA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/16/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

1/21/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/21/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - PARTLY GRANTED/PARTLY DENIED

1/21/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - PARTLY GRANTED/PARTLY DENIED

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

1/21/2021: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Proof of Service - PERSONAL

2/3/2021: Proof of Service - PERSONAL

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/21/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

1/21/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - PARTLY GRANTED/PARTLY DENIED

1/21/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - PARTLY GRANTED/PARTLY DENIED

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

1/21/2021: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 6, Titus, Patricia J, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Denied - RO- After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (PERSONAL ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (PARTLY GRANTED/PARTLY DENIED ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less