This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/20/2022 at 07:08:36 (UTC).

ARPENE HOVSEPIAN VS JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 ARPENE HOVSEPIAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2108

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOVSEPIAN ARPENE

Defendant

JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PEHLEVANIAN ZAVEN A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/18/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/4/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

3/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/7/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2025
  • Hearing01/14/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • Hearing07/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • Hearing07/05/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Arpene Hovsepian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Arpene Hovsepian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Arpene Hovsepian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Arpene Hovsepian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PEHLEVANIAN ZAVEN ARMEN