This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2020 at 00:24:36 (UTC).

ARNON RAPHAEL VS AZIM SHAALEMI, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 07/13/2017 ARNON RAPHAEL filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against AZIM SHAALEMI, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. MATZ and WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6999

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. MATZ

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAPHAEL ARNON

RAPHAEL ARNON TURSTEE OF THE ARNON

RAPHAEL ARNON TRUSTEE OF THE ARNON

Defendants

SHAALEMI AZIM AN INDIVIDUAL

AZIM SHALEMI TRUSTEE

SHAALEMI YAMA

AZIM SHAALEMI TRUST

SHAALEMI YAMA AN INDIVIDUAL

AZIM SHAALEMI FAMILY TRUST

SHAALEMI AZIM TRUSTEE OF THE AZIM

SHAALEMI AZIM

Trustee and Not Classified By Court

SHALEMI AZIM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCOTT A. SHEIKH

SHEIKH LAW FIRM THE

SHEIKH SCOTT A.

SHEIKH SCOTT AMIN

Defendant Attorneys

THOMAS F. NOWLAND

NOWLAND THOMAS F. LAW OFFICES OF

NOWLAND THOMAS F.

MONADJEMI YOUSEF

OPDAHL NEIL

 

Court Documents

Exhibit List

12/23/2019: Exhibit List

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/13/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/13/2017: Notice of Case Management Conference

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: COMPLAINT FILED-SUMMONS ISSUED

7/13/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: COMPLAINT FILED-SUMMONS ISSUED

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-10-30 00:00:00

10/30/2017: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-10-30 00:00:00

Case Management Statement

12/1/2017: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-01-17 00:00:00

1/17/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-01-17 00:00:00

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-05-21 00:00:00

5/21/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-05-21 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

5/25/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-06-18 00:00:00

6/18/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-06-18 00:00:00

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-08-24 00:00:00

8/24/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-08-24 00:00:00

Request For Copies

5/30/2019: Request For Copies

Substitution of Attorney

1/11/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - OF ENTRY OF ORDERS

8/29/2018: Notice - OF ENTRY OF ORDERS

Case Management Statement

10/18/2018: Case Management Statement

Substitution of Attorney -

10/9/2018: Substitution of Attorney -

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • Hearing01/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Jury Trial (and Final Status Conference) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial and Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketExhibit List; Filed by AZIM, SHAALEMI (Defendant); Shaalemi, Azim, Trustee of the Azim (Defendant); YAMA SHAALEMI (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketWitness List; Filed by AZIM, SHAALEMI (Defendant); Shaalemi, Azim, Trustee of the Azim (Defendant); YAMA SHAALEMI (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketExhibit List; Filed by ARNON RAPHAEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketPre-Trial Brief; Filed by ARNON RAPHAEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketWitness List; Filed by ARNON RAPHAEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketSubpoena Duces Tecum and Proof of Service; Filed by AZIM SHALEMI (Non-Party); AZIM, SHAALEMI (Defendant); Shaalemi, Azim, Trustee of the Azim (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketSubpoena Duces Tecum and Proof of Service; Filed by AZIM SHALEMI (Non-Party); AZIM, SHAALEMI (Defendant); Shaalemi, Azim, Trustee of the Azim (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by AZIM, SHAALEMI (Defendant); YAMA SHAALEMI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E; Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department NCGE, Laura A. Matz, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH TRIALCOURT DELAY REDUCTIO ACT) - Held-Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-09-28 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketNotice (OSC Re Failure to Comply With Trial Court Delay Reduction Act)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ARNON RAPHAEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less