This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2019 at 11:40:47 (UTC).

ARNOLD SCHEER MD MPH VS THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CA

Case Summary

On 04/26/2017 ARNOLD SCHEER MD MPH filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL and DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9170

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCHEER ARNOLD MD MPH

Defendants

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF

BINDER SCOTT MD.D/W/O/P

BRAUN JONATHAN MD. PH.D.D/W/O/P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

QUIGLEY MARK T. ESQ.

NICKERSON CHRISTIAN T F

QUIGLEY MARK THOMAS ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

FISHER & PHILLIPS LLP

MUNGER TOLLES & OLSON LLP

HECKENLIVELY BRYAN H

LINDEGREN KARL ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Order

11/27/2018: Order

DEFENDANT JONATHAN BRAUN, M.D.'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FORM INTERROGATORIES - EMPLOYMENT LAW SET ONE

8/20/2018: DEFENDANT JONATHAN BRAUN, M.D.'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FORM INTERROGATORIES - EMPLOYMENT LAW SET ONE

Declaration

5/15/2019: Declaration

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/15/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Affidavit

5/15/2019: Affidavit

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

5/15/2019: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Request for Judicial Notice

5/15/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Response

6/11/2019: Response

Opposition

6/11/2019: Opposition

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

8/7/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

JOINT STTPULATION RE: EXHAUSTION OF ADMINISTRATIVE REMEDIES

8/15/2018: JOINT STTPULATION RE: EXHAUSTION OF ADMINISTRATIVE REMEDIES

DEFENDANT JONATHAN BRAUN, M.D., PH.D.'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF ARNOLD SCHEER M.D.'S DEMAND TO INSPECT AND COPY, SET ONE

8/20/2018: DEFENDANT JONATHAN BRAUN, M.D., PH.D.'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF ARNOLD SCHEER M.D.'S DEMAND TO INSPECT AND COPY, SET ONE

DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND TO INSPECT AND COPY, SET THREE

8/20/2018: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND TO INSPECT AND COPY, SET THREE

ERRATA TO DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF ARNOLD SCHEER M.D.'S DEMAND TO INSPECT AND COPY, SET ONE, ETC

8/22/2018: ERRATA TO DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF ARNOLD SCHEER M.D.'S DEMAND TO INSPECT AND COPY, SET ONE, ETC

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

8/27/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

JOINT STIIPULATION

10/1/2018: JOINT STIIPULATION

Notice of Motion

10/31/2018: Notice of Motion

Minute Order

11/27/2018: Minute Order

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketResponse ([PLAINTIFF?S] TO DEFENDANT THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA?S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES); Filed by Arnold MD MPH Scheer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketOpposition ([PLAINTIFF?S] TO DEFENDANT THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES); Filed by Arnold MD MPH Scheer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by The Regents of The University of (Defendant); Jonathan MD. Ph.D.(D/W/O/P) Braun (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Filed by The Regents of The University of (Defendant); Jonathan MD. Ph.D.(D/W/O/P) Braun (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by The Regents of The University of (Defendant); Jonathan MD. Ph.D.(D/W/O/P) Braun (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketDeclaration ( OF SAMUEL ALLEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES); Filed by The Regents of The University of (Defendant); Jonathan MD. Ph.D.(D/W/O/P) Braun (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketOther - (INDEX OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES); Filed by The Regents of The University of (Defendant); Jonathan MD. Ph.D.(D/W/O/P) Braun (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Arnold MD MPH Scheer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. VIOLATION OF HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE 1278.5 ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Arnold MD MPH Scheer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Arnold MD MPH Scheer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****9170    Hearing Date: February 04, 2021    Dept: 51

Prior to approving the proposed judgement, Plaintiff is directed to confirm whether the Request for Entry of Default was properly served to Defendant pursuant to CCP ; 587 (“An application by a plaintiff for entry of default … shall include an affidavit stating that a copy of the application has been mailed to the defendant's attorney of record or, if none, to the defendant at his or her last known address and the date on which the copy was mailed).

Here, while Plaintiff’s summons and complaint were served to Defendant’s counsel’s email and mailing address, the Entry of Judgment form (CIV-100) indicates that it was only mailed to Defendant’s last known personal address at 15943 Victory Blvd., Apt. 6, Van Nuys, California 91406-6463. Plaintiff needs to confirm mailing to Defendant’s counsel’s address as well.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF NEW MEXICO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NICKERSON CHRISTIAN T F

Latest cases represented by Lawyer QUIGLEY MARK T.