This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2023 at 04:35:12 (UTC).

ARNEH AGHAKHANI VS BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 ARNEH AGHAKHANI filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0367

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGHAKHANI ARNEH

Defendants

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

PACIFIC BMW A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAYLOR NORMAN F.

Defendant Attorney

HOM BRIAN M

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/23/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/23/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/23/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/23/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/23/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/23/2023: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

3/10/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/29/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

4/12/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2023
  • Hearing08/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • Hearing06/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Norman F. Taylor (Attorney): First Name changed from NORMAN to Norman; Last Name changed from TAYLOR to Taylor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketAddress for Norman F. Taylor (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Norman F. Taylor (Attorney): Organization Name: Norman Taylor & Associates

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Brian M Hom (Attorney): Organization Name changed from CLARK HILL LLP to Clark Hill LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketAddress for Brian M Hom (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: BMW of North America, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); As to: Arneh Aghakhani (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Arneh Aghakhani (Plaintiff); As to: Pacific BMW, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/17/2023; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Arneh Aghakhani (Plaintiff); As to: BMW of North America, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Service Cost: 80.00; Service Date: 03/08/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ralph C. Hofer in Department D Glendale Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Arneh Aghakhani (Plaintiff); As to: BMW of North America, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Pacific BMW, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Arneh Aghakhani (Plaintiff); As to: BMW of North America, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Pacific BMW, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Arneh Aghakhani (Plaintiff); As to: BMW of North America, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Pacific BMW, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less