This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/15/2022 at 09:31:37 (UTC).

ARMOUND HAMBARCHIAN VS NICKO NACHELLIE CHANEY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 ARMOUND HAMBARCHIAN filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NICKO NACHELLIE CHANEY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2013

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAMBARCHIAN ARMOUND

Defendants

CHANEY NICKO NACHELLIE

SANDERFORD FELIX

DOLLAR RENT A CAR INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VALLES MEGAN

Defendant Attorneys

GIBBS PATRICK JOSEPH

DALL TERRY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/30/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

9/27/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/8/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

11/8/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

11/8/2021: Answer

Request for Dismissal

4/8/2022: Request for Dismissal

Demand for Jury Trial

12/28/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

12/28/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

12/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

11/23/2021: Request for Dismissal

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/23/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Armound Hambarchian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Dollar Rent A Car, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Dollar Rent A Car, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Armound Hambarchian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Armound Hambarchian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Armound Hambarchian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Nicko Nachellie Chaney (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Nicko Nachellie Chaney (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Nicko Nachellie Chaney (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Armound Hambarchian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Armound Hambarchian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Armound Hambarchian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DOLLAR RENT A CAR INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VALLES MEGAN