This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/20/2022 at 06:38:54 (UTC).

ARMEN MINASSIAN VS MADELENE MINASSIAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 ARMEN MINASSIAN filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against MADELENE MINASSIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SHIRLEY K. WATKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0056

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SHIRLEY K. WATKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MINASSIAN ARMEN

Defendants

MINASSIAN ARTHUR

PACELLI BLAYNE

MINASSIAN MADELENE

MINASSIAN ALICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

WOODBURY ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/18/2022

1/18/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/18/2022

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE THAT DEFENDANT ALICE MINASSIAN IS DECEASED

12/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE THAT DEFENDANT ALICE MINASSIAN IS DECEASED

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY) OF 11/10/2021

11/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY) OF 11/10/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

11/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

Notice of Ruling

11/10/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER (RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES))

11/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER (RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES))

Notice of Related Case

11/16/2021: Notice of Related Case

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER (RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)) OF 11/16/2021

11/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER (RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)) OF 11/16/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER (RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)) OF 11/16/2021

11/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER (RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)) OF 11/16/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW (RE: DEMURRER SET 11/10/2021-OFF C...) OF 10/26/2021

10/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW (RE: DEMURRER SET 11/10/2021-OFF C...) OF 10/26/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW (RE: DEMURRER SET 11/10/2021-OFF C...)

10/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW (RE: DEMURRER SET 11/10/2021-OFF C...)

Status Report

11/3/2021: Status Report

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/30/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Order - ORDER AND NOTICES: (1) RELATING AND TRANSFERRING CASE PER OSC; (2) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES, (3) NOTICE THAT UD TRIAL FOR POSSESSION REMAINS ON CALENDAR; (4) NOTICE OF STAY AND

5/11/2021: Order - ORDER AND NOTICES: (1) RELATING AND TRANSFERRING CASE PER OSC; (2) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES, (3) NOTICE THAT UD TRIAL FOR POSSESSION REMAINS ON CALENDAR; (4) NOTICE OF STAY AND

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; ORDER TO SHOW...)

5/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; ORDER TO SHOW...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; ORDER TO SHOW...) OF 05/11/2021

5/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; ORDER TO SHOW...) OF 05/11/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARINGS: 05/11/2021 830AM DEPT...)

4/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARINGS: 05/11/2021 830AM DEPT...)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • Hearing02/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Order to Show Cause Re: Why sanctions in the amount of $250 should not be assessed against Plaintiff Armen Minassian, for failure to appear at Case Management Conference pursuant to Local Rule 3.37, Local Rule 3.25(a)(1) and CRC 3.722(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • Hearing02/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Order to Show Cause Re: Why sanctions in the amount of $150 should not be assessed against Plaintiff Armen Minassian for failure to serve the complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b) and (f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 01/18/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice that Defendant Alice Minassian is Deceased); Filed by Alice Minassian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • Docketat 09:02 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order (Re: Notice of Related Cases)) of 11/16/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order (Re: Notice of Related Cases)) of 11/16/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order (Re: Notice of Related Cases))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Notice of ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE hearings: 05/11/2021 830AM Dept...) of 04/28/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Alice Minassian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Alice Minassian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Alice Minassian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF REJECTION (PLEADINGS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Armen Minassian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Armen Minassian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 21VECV00056    Hearing Date: May 11, 2021    Dept: T

TENTATIVE RULINGS 5/11/2021

21VECV00056 (CIVIL ACTION) MINASSIAN V MINASSIAN –AND-- 20VEUD00919 (EVICTION ACTION) MINASSIAN V MINASSIAN

1.  RELATED CASES: The court relates the cases pursuant to California Rules of Court 3.300 because these cases meet the requirements. A pending civil case is related to another pending civil case, or to a civil case that was dismissed with or without prejudice, or to a civil case that was disposed of by judgment, if the cases:

(1)  Involve the same parties and are based on the same or similar claims;

(2)  Arise from the same or substantially identical transactions, incidents, or events requiring the determination of the same or substantially identical questions of law or fact;

(3)  Involve claims against, title to, possession of, or damages to the same property; or

(4)  Are likely for other reasons to require substantial duplication of judicial resources if heard by different judges.

Here, there both cases involve claims for damages against same parties and claims for rights to the same property, among other things.

Accordingly, 20VEUD00919 is related to 21VECV00056 Minassian v Minassian and is transferred for all purposes, including trial, to Civil Independent Calendar, Dept. T, Judge Shirley K. Watkins. 

2. BANKRUPTCY: The civil action is stayed. The UD action is stayed as to damages but the stay has been lifted as to the action for possession only.

3. CONSOLIDATION: The motion to consolidate filed in the UD action is DENIED. No good cause is shown. The issues in the UD case can be tried independent of the civil action. 

4. UD TRIAL: Trial remains set on the UD case for possession only on 5/14/2021 at 8:30 a.m. Trial as to damages is stayed pending the Bankruptcy.

5. DEMURRER on the civil action: In light of the pending bankruptcy, the civil action is automatically stayed, including for discovery. The hearing on the demurrer is stayed and continued to ____________. The court reminds all parties and counsel of the requirement for civility in pleadings, and the requirement of counsel to follow State Bar and Local Rules on civility. Personal attacks, insults and demeaning statements have no place in court pleadings and proceedings.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOODBURY ROBERT