This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 18:44:59 (UTC).

ARMANDO VENTURA, ET AL. VS SANTOS F. FRIAS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 ARMANDO VENTURA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SANTOS F FRIAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6907

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LUJAN CORINA

VENTURA ARMANDO

Defendants

DOORDASH INC.

FRIAS IRMA SANTOS

FRIAS SANTOS F. ALIAS SANTOS F. FRIASMADERO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KORO CHARLES EDWIN

Defendant Attorneys

RASHTIAN SIAVASH

BURGER WILLIAM D.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/6/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/6/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

12/16/2021: Answer

Answer

11/19/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/10/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Mail

11/10/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Personal Service

11/10/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

11/3/2021: PI General Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/17/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2024
  • Hearing10/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • Hearing04/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • Hearing03/22/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Armando Ventura (Plaintiff); Corina Lujan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Santos F. Frias Madero Erroneously Sued As Santos F. Frias (Defendant); Irma Frias Erroneously Sued As Irma Santos Frias (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Doordash, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Armando Ventura (Plaintiff); Corina Lujan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Armando Ventura (Plaintiff); Corina Lujan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Armando Ventura (Plaintiff); Corina Lujan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Armando Ventura (Plaintiff); Corina Lujan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Armando Ventura (Plaintiff); Corina Lujan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Armando Ventura (Plaintiff); Corina Lujan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Doordash, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KORO CHARLES EDWIN