This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2019 at 09:54:54 (UTC).

ARMANDO ROEL VS. NUMARK TRANSPORTATION, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/07/2017 ARMANDO ROEL filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against NUMARK TRANSPORTATION, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARGARET MILLER BERNAL. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6408

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROEL ARMANDO

Defendant

NUMARK TRANSPORTATION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ELDESSOUKY LAW APC

ELDESSOUKY MOHAMED AHMED

Defendant Attorney

MENDELSON LITTLER

Other Attorneys

LITTLER MENDELSON

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

9/27/2018: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order

11/29/2018: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

11/29/2018: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by ARMANDO ROEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-04 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by ARMANDO ROEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Notice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F; Trial Setting Conference (Trial Setting Conference; Trial and MSC Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-06-14 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2017
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by ARMANDO ROEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • at 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-12-12 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by ARMANDO ROEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by NUMARK TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by ARMANDO ROEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by ARMANDO ROEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by ARMANDO ROEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NUMARK TRANSPORTATION is a litigant