This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/01/2021 at 15:28:30 (UTC).

ARMANDO MEJIA VS WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 ARMANDO MEJIA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WELLS FARGO BANK, N A . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5947

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEJIA ARMANDO

Defendants

WELLS FARGO & COMPANY

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAZERKANIAN H. JACK

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/30/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/30/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

9/29/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • Hearing01/12/2022 at 09:45 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • Hearing12/14/2021 at 10:15 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Armando Mejia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Armando Mejia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Armando Mejia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WELLS FARGO & COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAZERKANIAN H. JACK ESQ.