This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 07:19:32 (UTC).

ARMANDO GARCIA VS CITY OF LA PUENTE ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/16/2017 ARMANDO GARCIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LA PUENTE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4361

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GARCIA ARMANDO

Defendants and Respondents

KALBAN INC

LA PUENTE CITY OF

DOES 1 TO 100

LI LILY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

RYANEN ERIC I. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BARBER JOHN C. ESQ.

PARTOS MICHAEL J. ESQ.

WAINFELD GABRIEL H. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

ANSWER OF CITY OF LA PUENTE TO COMPLAINT

8/11/2017: ANSWER OF CITY OF LA PUENTE TO COMPLAINT

SUMMONS

3/16/2017: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

6/11/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Unknown

2/23/2018: Unknown

KALBAN, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

8/21/2017: KALBAN, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (DANGEROUS CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY, GOVERNMENT CODE 820 (A); NEGLIGENCE; BREACH OF CONTRACT)

3/16/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (DANGEROUS CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY, GOVERNMENT CODE 820 (A); NEGLIGENCE; BREACH OF CONTRACT)

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/16/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF TAKING THE DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF ARMANDO GARCIA OFF CALENDAR

5/17/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING THE DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF ARMANDO GARCIA OFF CALENDAR

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/20/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

7/16/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

9/25/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/9/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

8/28/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

10/31/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

8/28/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/2/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by La Puente, City of (Defendant); Kalban, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by La Puente, City of (Defendant); Kalban, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Armando Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Kalban, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • ANSWER OF CITY OF LA PUENTE TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Answer; Filed by La Puente, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Armando Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Armando Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Armando Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (DANGEROUS CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY, GOVERNMENT CODE 820 (A); NEGLIGENCE; BREACH OF CONTRACT)

    Read MoreRead Less