This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 20:54:42 (UTC).

ARMANDO ABEYTA, ET AL. VS 3A MANAGEMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 ARMANDO ABEYTA filed a Contract - Business Governance lawsuit against 3A MANAGEMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0769

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business Governance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ABEYTA ARMANDO

ABEYTA ALEJANDRO

Defendants

3A MANAGEMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ABEYTA ARTURO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS JOHN

Other Attorneys

KIRK J. DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/10/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

3/10/2021: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/6/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

4/22/2021: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE ON ARTURO ABEYTA

5/19/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE ON ARTURO ABEYTA

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

6/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

6/8/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/8/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

9/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • Hearing12/02/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 85 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by 3A Management, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Arturo Abeyta (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Armando Abeyta (Plaintiff); Alejandro Abeyta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE ON ARTURO ABEYTA); Filed by Armando Abeyta (Plaintiff); Alejandro Abeyta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by 3A Management, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Arturo Abeyta (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Armando Abeyta (Plaintiff); Alejandro Abeyta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Armando Abeyta (Plaintiff); Alejandro Abeyta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Armando Abeyta (Plaintiff); Alejandro Abeyta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Armando Abeyta (Plaintiff); Alejandro Abeyta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Armando Abeyta (Plaintiff); Alejandro Abeyta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIRK, J. DOUGLAS