This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2022 at 19:54:51 (UTC).

ARMAN MAJIDI VS JACEK KUGLER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/09/2019 ARMAN MAJIDI filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against JACEK KUGLER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1832

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAJIDI ARMAN

Defendants

CLAREMONT GRADUATE UNIVERSITY

KUGLER JACEK

JACEK KUGLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAYLOR BENJAMIN

Defendant Attorneys

BRENNER JONATHAN M.

MANOLATOU VANESSA KATERINA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED F...)

9/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED F...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN TAYLOR IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

9/18/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN TAYLOR IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Request for Dismissal

7/28/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PR...)

8/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PR...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PR...) OF 08/28/2020

8/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PR...) OF 08/28/2020

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/12/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/12/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Order to Show Cause re: Payment of Waived Fees

7/29/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Payment of Waived Fees

Notice of Settlement

7/14/2020: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/15/2020

7/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/15/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/14/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

4/22/2020: Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

4/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/28/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/28/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/13/2020

4/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/13/2020

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why Sanctions should not be imposed for plaintiff's failure to appear and failure to pay waived fees) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions should not be imposed f...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Benjamin Taylor in Response to Order to Show Cause); Filed by Arman Majidi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of payment of waived fees) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of payment of waived fees) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Order to Show Cause Re: Pr...) of 08/28/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Order to Show Cause Re: Pr...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Jonathan M. Brenner regarding Automatic 30-Day Extension to File Demurrer Under CCP section 430.41(a)(2)); Filed by Jacek Kugler (Defendant); Claremont Graduate University (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Arman Majidi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Arman Majidi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Arman Majidi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Arman Majidi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Arman Majidi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLAREMONT GRADUATE UNIVERSITY is a litigant