This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 00:07:28 (UTC).

ARLANDER FAVORS ET AL VS DEBRA L REED ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/07/2017 ARLANDER FAVORS filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against DEBRA L REED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CAROLYN B. KUHL and YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4302

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CAROLYN B. KUHL

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FAVORS ARLANDER

LANE J. BRET

OUCHI WILLIAM G.

WYRSCH MARTHA B.

TAYLOR JACK T.

BROWN KATHLEEN L.

SCHENK LYNN

BOECKMANN ALAN L.

SCHNEIDER DOUG

RUTLEDGE WILLIAM P.

CHO JIMMIE I.

Defendants

HOUSEHOLDER JOSEPH A.

SEMPRA ENERGY

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

DAVIS STEVEN D.

RUSNAK WILLIAM C.

BIRD JUSTIN C.

JONES WILLIAM D.

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOTTINI JR. FRANCIS A.

 

Court Documents

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (C.C.P., ? 170.6)

12/4/2018: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (C.C.P., ? 170.6)

Minute Order

12/5/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/12/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/3/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/9/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/4/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/11/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/25/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/8/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/11/2019: Minute Order

SUMMONS

6/7/2017: SUMMONS

STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY AND AIDING AND ABETTING BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY

6/7/2017: STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY AND AIDING AND ABETTING BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY

Minute Order

6/20/2017: Minute Order

Notice

6/29/2017: Notice

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

7/14/2017: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

7/14/2017: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

7/14/2017: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

7/14/2017: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2019
  • Docketat 2:15 PM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Further Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Further Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Docketat 2:45 PM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference; Initial Status Conference 5 new cases; Hea...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing - Other Re Reassignment)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Status of Reassignment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Complaint -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Complaint -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketNotice NOTICE OF ENTRY OF MINUTE ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by ARLANDER FAVORS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 309; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-06-20 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ARLANDER FAVORS (Plaintiff); WILLIAM G. OUCHI (Plaintiff); JAMES G. JR. BROCKSMITH (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketSTOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY AND AIDING AND ABETTING BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOUSEHOLDER JOSEPH A. is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bottini, Francis Alexander