Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2021 at 02:05:59 (UTC).

ARKIA WHITLEY, ET AL. VS LEONARDO APARTMENTS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 ARKIA WHITLEY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LEONARDO APARTMENTS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0993

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WHITLEY ARKIA

PALMER DEANDRE M.

Defendants

LEONARDO APARTMENTS

LONG BEACH AFFORDABLE HOUSING COALITION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARIYELI JACOB O.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

5/10/2021: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Request for Dismissal

5/13/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

3/2/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/03/2021

3/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/03/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Mail

9/22/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Personal Service

8/31/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/20/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DOLYN

8/20/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DOLYN

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ARKIA

8/20/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ARKIA

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DE ANDRE

8/26/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DE ANDRE

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/17/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/17/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/17/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/17/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint

8/17/2020: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (After Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Arkia Whitley (Plaintiff); DeAndre M. Palmer (Plaintiff); De Andre Palmer (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docketat 11:40 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/03/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Arkia Whitley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Arkia Whitley (Plaintiff); DeAndre M. Palmer (Plaintiff); De Andre Palmer (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for De Andre); Filed by Arkia Whitley (Plaintiff); DeAndre M. Palmer (Plaintiff); De Andre Palmer (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Arkia); Filed by Arkia Whitley (Plaintiff); DeAndre M. Palmer (Plaintiff); De Andre Palmer (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Arkia Whitley (Plaintiff); DeAndre M. Palmer (Plaintiff); De Andre Palmer (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Dolyn); Filed by Arkia Whitley (Plaintiff); DeAndre M. Palmer (Plaintiff); De Andre Palmer (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Arkia Whitley (Plaintiff); DeAndre M. Palmer (Plaintiff); De Andre Palmer (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LONG BEACH AFFORDABLE HOUSING COALITION INC. is a litigant