This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/26/2021 at 02:04:11 (UTC).

ARIELLE BURTON VS ELVIA LIZARRAGA

Case Summary

On 12/11/2017 ARIELLE BURTON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ELVIA LIZARRAGA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6529

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BURTON ARIELLE

Defendants

LIZARRAGA ELVIA

GONZALEZ ISREAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

MASTROIANNI A. DOUGLAS ESQ.

MASTROIANNI ALBERT DOUGLAS ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

WASSON DAVID B. ESQ.

WASSON DAVID BRADLEY ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANTS ELVIA LIZARRAGA AND ISRAEL GONZALEZ'S MOTION TO DI...)

6/10/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANTS ELVIA LIZARRAGA AND ISRAEL GONZALEZ'S MOTION TO DI...)

Notice of Ruling

6/10/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

6/10/2019: Notice of Ruling

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLA...) OF 06/11/2019

6/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLA...) OF 06/11/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLA...)

6/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLA...)

Notice of Ruling

6/17/2019: Notice of Ruling

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFFS APPEAR FOR DEPOSITIONS

7/25/2019: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFFS APPEAR FOR DEPOSITIONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANTS ELVIA LIZARRAGA AND ISRAEL GONZALEZ'S EX PARTE APP...)

8/14/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANTS ELVIA LIZARRAGA AND ISRAEL GONZALEZ'S EX PARTE APP...)

Notice of Ruling

8/14/2019: Notice of Ruling

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

8/14/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Notice of Ruling

9/11/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFFS TO APPEAR ...)

9/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFFS TO APPEAR ...)

Motion re: - MOTION RE: FOR ORDER TERMINATING SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS' ACTION

10/17/2019: Motion re: - MOTION RE: FOR ORDER TERMINATING SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS' ACTION

Notice of Ruling

11/26/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL OF PLA...)

11/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL OF PLA...)

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

1/25/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

1/25/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

1/25/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Order (terminating sanctions/Dismissal of plaintiffs' action) - Held - Motion Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Elvia Lizarraga (Defendant); Isreal Gonzalez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Defendant's Motion for Terminating Sanctions/Dismissal of Pla...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketMotion re: (Order Terminating Sanctions/Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Action); Filed by Elvia Lizarraga (Defendant); Isreal Gonzalez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Order (Compelling Plaintiffs to Appear for Depositions) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Elvia Lizarraga (Defendant); Isreal Gonzalez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Defendants' Motion for Order Compelling Plaintiffs to Appear ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT - DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Elvia Lizarraga (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Elvia Lizarraga (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by ARIELLE BURTON (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ARIELLE BURTON (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****6529    Hearing Date: November 26, 2019    Dept: 4A

Motion for Terminating Sanctions

Having considered the moving papers, the Court rules as follows.  

BACKGROUND

On December 11, 2017, Plaintiffs Arielle Burton, individually and as guardian for Levin Whitney and Landayn Whitney, and Daphney White (“Plaintiffs”) filed a complaint against Defendants Elvia Lizarraga and Isreal Gonzalez (“Defendants”) for motor vehicle negligence based on an incident that occurred on June 3, 2017.

On June 11, 2019, The Court dismissed the complaint in granting Defendants’ request for terminating sanctions.

On October 17, 2019, Defendants filed a motion for terminating sanctions pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure section 2025.450, subdivision (d).

Trial is set for March 2, 2020.

PARTIES REQUESTS

Defendants ask the Court to issue terminating sanctions because of Plaintiffs’ failure to obey a September 11, 2019 Court order.

ANALYSIS

The Court finds Defendants’ motion is unripe.  The Court issued terminating sanctions on June 11, 2019 dismissing the complaint in its entirety.  This action has not been reinstated.  As such, the issuance of terminating sanctions here is unnecessary.

The motion is DENIED.

All future hearing dates are VACATED.

Defendants are ordered to give notice of this ruling.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MASTROIANNI ALBERT DOUGLAS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MASTROIANNI A. DOUGLAS ESQ.