Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2021 at 06:59:44 (UTC).

ARIEL GOZLAN VS ODETTE BAILEY ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/23/2017 ARIEL GOZLAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ODETTE BAILEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHRISTOPHER K. LUI, STEPHEN M. MOLONEY, DANIEL M. CROWLEY and MICHAEL I. LEVANAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5145

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

STEPHEN M. MOLONEY

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

MICHAEL I. LEVANAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Respondents

GOZLAN ARIEL

NATIONWIDE LEGAL LLC

THOMPSON ATTORNEY SERVICE INC.

Defendants, Respondents and Appellants

BAILEY ODETTE

DOES 1-10

BAILEY BRUCE

PANISH SHEA & BOYLE LLP

MARK P LASCOLA

GOZLAN ARIEL

Defendant and Other

PANISH SHEA & BOYLE LLP

Plaintiffs and Not Classified By Court

NATIONWIDE LEGAL LLC

HESTER DAYNA

LASCOLA MARK P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GILBERT & STERN LLP

CASEY RYAN ABRAM

STERN MORRIS MICHAEL

YOKA NICHOLAS WALTER

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GIBBS PATRICK J. ESQ.

FORD WALKER HAGGERTY & BEHAR

GIBBS PATRICK JOSEPH

PICKARD ASHLEY ELIZABETH

PAULSON JOHN KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

9/17/2020: Case Management Statement

Appeal - Notice of Default Issued

8/18/2020: Appeal - Notice of Default Issued

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/22/2020

4/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/22/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MOTION TO TAX COSTS)

4/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MOTION TO TAX COSTS)

Motion for New Trial

4/6/2020: Motion for New Trial

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

3/27/2020: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

3/30/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

3/12/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

Other - - OTHER - "ELECTION TO FORGO AFFIDAVIT (CCP SECT. 170.6)

3/3/2020: Other - - OTHER - "ELECTION TO FORGO AFFIDAVIT (CCP SECT. 170.6)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE VIDEO

2/28/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE VIDEO

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY, AND ARGUMENT REGARDING PRIOR LAWSUITS OR REPRIMANDS AGAINST ANY PHYSICIAN

3/2/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY, AND ARGUMENT REGARDING PRIOR LAWSUITS OR REPRIMANDS AGAINST ANY PHYSICIAN

Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO EXCLUDE AND/OR LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT EXPERT WITNESS LUKE MACYSZYN, M.D.

2/13/2020: Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO EXCLUDE AND/OR LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT EXPERT WITNESS LUKE MACYSZYN, M.D.

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RYAN A. CASEY REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST

12/27/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RYAN A. CASEY REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MIL NO 4

1/2/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MIL NO 4

Statement of the Case

1/2/2020: Statement of the Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/27/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff for Order Continuing Trial,...)

3/5/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff for Order Continuing Trial,...)

121 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • Hearing09/28/2021 at 13:30 PM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Defendant Odette Bailey's Motion to Continue Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Defendant Odette Bailey's Motion to Continue Trial) of 03/26/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketODETTE BAILEYS NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; Filed by Odette Bailey (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketAppeal Record Delivered; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 2 Volumes Certified NOA 07/30/20; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketMotion to Continue Trial Date (OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, VACATE TRIAL DATE;); Filed by Odette Bailey (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid (RESPONDENT PAID $262.37)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid (APPELLANT PAID $414.87)

    Read MoreRead Less
169 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2017
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Odette Bailey (Defendant); Bruce Bailey (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Odette Bailey (Defendant); Bruce Bailey (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Odette Bailey (Defendant); Bruce Bailey (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Ariel Gozlan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Ariel Gozlan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ariel Gozlan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC655145    Hearing Date: March 26, 2021    Dept: 28

The court would like the parties to address the issue of whether the case is stayed pursuant to CCP 916.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THOMPSON ATTORNEY SERVICE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PANISH SHEA & BOYLE LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONWIDE LEGAL LLC is a litigant