This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/06/2022 at 10:24:32 (UTC).

ARIEL GONZALES GUTIERREZ VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2021 ARIEL GONZALES GUTIERREZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6860

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUTIERREZ ARIEL GONZALES

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

KORDA CONSTRUCTION CO.

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Cross Defendant and Defendant

KORDA CONSTRUCTION CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEINER JON MATTHEW

Defendant Attorneys

BACIO GARY A.

PELCH MANAL H.

WOODWARD KAREN ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/23/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

3/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

12/30/2021: PI General Order

Answer

4/26/2022: Answer

Answer

4/20/2022: Answer

Answer

5/17/2022: Answer

Answer

5/13/2022: Answer

Cross-Complaint

6/3/2022: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2024
  • Hearing12/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • Hearing06/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • Hearing06/08/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by The People Of The State Of California, Acting By And Through The Department Of Transportation Erroneously Sued As State of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ARIEL GONZALES GUTIERREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ARIEL GONZALES GUTIERREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ARIEL GONZALES GUTIERREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ARIEL GONZALES GUTIERREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ARIEL GONZALES GUTIERREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ARIEL GONZALES GUTIERREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ARIEL GONZALES GUTIERREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KORDA CONSTRUCTION CO. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEINER JON MATTHEW