This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2021 at 17:36:19 (UTC).

ARIEL FORD VS NEW CONGREGATIONAL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 ARIEL FORD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NEW CONGREGATIONAL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4842

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD ARIEL

Defendants

TAYLOR KELLY

NEW CONGREGATIONAL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH

ZAIRE DENNIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LUCERO LINDA

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

3/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

3/5/2021: PI General Order

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/8/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/8/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2024
  • Hearing02/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • Hearing08/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • Hearing07/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ariel Ford (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ariel Ford (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUCERO LINDA