This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/14/2021 at 23:13:25 (UTC).

ARIEJ ALHAIDARI VS INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF AUTOMOBILE CLUB

Case Summary

On 08/05/2021 ARIEJ ALHAIDARI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF AUTOMOBILE CLUB. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1322

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALHAIDARI ARIEJ

Defendant

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF AUTOMOBILE CLUB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEUTHE ERIC B

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/5/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/6/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • Hearing02/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ARIEJ ALHAIDARI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ARIEJ ALHAIDARI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ARIEJ ALHAIDARI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF ERIC BRYAN SEUTHE