This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2021 at 07:22:57 (UTC).

ARIANA PROPERTIES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY;, ET AL. VS CITY OF WEST HOLLYWOOD;

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 ARIANA PROPERTIES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF WEST HOLLYWOOD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RUTH ANN KWAN and CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4010

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RUTH ANN KWAN

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARIANA RUGS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION;

ARIANA PROPERTIES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY;

ARIANA PROPERTIES LLC

ARIANA RUGS INC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CITY OF WEST HOLLYWOOD;

CITY OF WEST HOLLYWOOD

AMPCO CONTRACTING INC.

TRIANGLE ENTERPRISES INC.

Cross Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

CITY OF WEST HOLLYWOOD

SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

AMPCO CONTRACTING INC.

TRIANGLE ENTERPRISES INC.

SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT INC.

ROES 1 - 50 INCLUSIVE

AMPCO CONTRACTING INC. ROE 2

TRIANGLE ENTERPRISES INC ROE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEWIS MICHAEL

WHALEN DANIEL C.

LEWIS MICHAEL P.

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

TAN DOMINGO R.

BERGSTEN ROBERT

HAITH SCOTT

Cross Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

DAVIS SCOTT

JONES TODD A.

BERGSTEN ROBERT

HAITH SCOTT

BERGSTROM JULIA L.

TAN DOMINGO R.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

10/21/2021: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

10/15/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/15/2021

10/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/15/2021

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/7/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Answer

6/8/2021: Answer

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/10/2021: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer

5/10/2021: Answer

Answer

5/12/2021: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/20/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/20/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Refund / Order

4/21/2021: Request for Refund / Order

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/2/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Request for Refund / Order

3/18/2021: Request for Refund / Order

Answer

3/10/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

3/11/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer - ANSWER AMPCO CONTRACTING, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/11/2021: Answer - ANSWER AMPCO CONTRACTING, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Proof of Service - No Service

2/17/2021: Proof of Service - No Service

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • Hearing07/18/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • Hearing07/11/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by Triangle Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 72, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (To Continue Trial); Filed by City of West Hollywood (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/15/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of West Hollywood (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 72, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: proof of services;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of West Hollywood (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ariana Properties, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ariana Properties, LLC (Plaintiff); Ariana Rugs, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ariana Properties, LLC (Plaintiff); Ariana Rugs, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ariana Properties, LLC (Plaintiff); Ariana Rugs, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ariana Properties, LLC (Plaintiff); Ariana Rugs, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMPCO CONTRACTING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TRIANGLE ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where THE CITY OF WEST HOLLYWOOD is a litigant