This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 04:10:57 (UTC).

ARGON INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT LLC VS EMMA CHANNING ESQ ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/04/2017 ARGON INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EMMA CHANNING ESQ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5466

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARGON INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendants

SATIS GROUP LLC

HOURIGAN FRANK

O'NEILL BEN

WEIR BILL

FUREY TIMOTHY

LAWLOR QUINN

ESQ EMMA CHANNING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DURIE TANGRI LLP

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/8/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/8/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

2/1/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

2/1/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Unknown

2/14/2018: Unknown

SECOND STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

2/20/2018: SECOND STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

2/20/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order

2/21/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

4/6/2018: Unknown

Unknown

4/6/2018: Unknown

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/20/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/20/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

4/23/2018: Minute Order

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

12/26/2017: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/20/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/27/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS

12/4/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY BY ATTORNEY ;ETC

12/4/2017: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY BY ATTORNEY ;ETC

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2018
  • Docketat 09:31 AM in Department 86; Unknown Event Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketPartial Dismissal(not entire case); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketPartial Dismissal(not entire case); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketDEFENDANTS' SPECIAL APPFARANCE AND OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF BROOK T. BARNES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' SPECIAL APPEARANCE OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketCOMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND EXPEDITED DISCOVERY ORDER:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ARGON INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY BY ATTORNEY ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****5466    Hearing Date: March 09, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

RENE LEON,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

ICES EDUCATION, LLC, et al.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC685446

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING PETITIONER’S PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF MINOR WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

March 9, 2020

Plaintiff, Rene Leon, a minor by and through his GAL, Christina Leon, filed this action against Defendant, ICES Education, LLC for damages.

Plaintiff, by and through his GAL and attorney, has agreed to settle this action with Defendant for the total amount of $120,000. If approved, $30,000 will be used for attorneys’ fees, $8006.81 for medical expenses, and $6181.96 for costs of suit. Petitioner proposes to place the net settlement amount of $75,811.23 in a blocked account.

The petition is denied without prejudice for the following reasons:

Dated this 9th day of March, 2020

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court