This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/18/2019 at 01:48:25 (UTC).

ARENAS ENTERTAINMENT LLC VS KATZ CASSIDY ACCOUNTANCY CORPORA

Case Summary

On 05/15/2018 a Contract - Professional Negligence case was filed by ARENAS ENTERTAINMENT LLC against KATZ CASSIDY ACCOUNTANCY CORPORA in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6172

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ARENAS ENTERTAINMENT LLC

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-100

KATZ CASSIDY ACCOUNTANCY CORPORATION

RONALD A. STEIN ACCOUNTANCY CORPORATION

KOPF PHILIPPE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/8/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Brief

8/8/2019: Brief

Objection

8/16/2019: Objection

Objection

8/16/2019: Objection

Separate Statement

8/16/2019: Separate Statement

DEFENDANT KATZ CASSIDY ACCOUNTANCY CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

6/22/2018: DEFENDANT KATZ CASSIDY ACCOUNTANCY CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Minute Order

7/2/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANT KATZ CASSIDY ACCOUNTANCY CORPORATIONS NOTICE OF INTENT TO POST JURY FEES

7/26/2018: DEFENDANT KATZ CASSIDY ACCOUNTANCY CORPORATIONS NOTICE OF INTENT TO POST JURY FEES

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

8/10/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

11/13/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Cross-Complaint

4/4/2019: Cross-Complaint

Summons

4/4/2019: Summons

Order

4/4/2019: Order

Notice

4/8/2019: Notice

Separate Statement

4/18/2019: Separate Statement

DEFENDANT'S, RONALD A. STEIN ACCOUNTANCY CORPORATION, ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

6/11/2018: DEFENDANT'S, RONALD A. STEIN ACCOUNTANCY CORPORATION, ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNIFICATION, APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

6/11/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNIFICATION, APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

SUMMONS

5/15/2018: SUMMONS

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • Hearing09/28/2020 at 09:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • Hearing09/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • Hearing08/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING DEFENDANT KATZ CASSIDY ACCOUNTANCY CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION); Filed by Katz Cassidy Accountancy Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketRuling-Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketRuling-Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVCIE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Arenas Entertainment, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR 1. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC706172    Hearing Date: January 07, 2020    Dept: 47

Arenas Entertainment LLC v. Katz Cassidy Accountancy Corporation, et al.

 

AMENDED MOTION TO ADVANCE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Arenas Entertainment, LLC

RESPONDING PARTY(S): Defendant Katz Cassidy Accountancy Corporation and Cross-Defendant Antonia De Leon (separate oppositions)

STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS AND/OR PROCEEDINGS:

Plaintiff alleges that Defendant accountants billed Plaintiff for accounting services but failed to advise Plaintiff that its former controller was stealing money from Plaintiff, although Defendants knew Plaintiff was relying on them to monitor for such activity.

Defendant Ronald A. Stein Accountancy Corporation filed a cross-complaint for indemnification and apportionment of fault, and Defendant Katz Cassidy Accountancy Corporation filed a cross-complaint for indemnification and other claims, including negligent and intentional interference with prospective economic advantage and with contractual relations.

Plaintiff now seeks to advance the trial date.

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Arenas Entertainment, Inc.’s motion to advance the trial date and related dates is DENIED.

DISCUSSION:

Motion To Advance Trial Date

Plaintiff moves to advance the trial date on the ground that it would have never agreed to a continuance if it had known that the trial date would be continued to September 2020, as opposed to October 2019 or thereabouts as proposed by the parties.

A request to advance a case for trial “may be granted only upon an affirmative showing by the moving party of good cause based on a declaration served and filed with the motion or application.” (CRC 3.1335(b).)

Plaintiff has shown no good cause here. Plaintiff and the other parties agreed to continue the trial date to October 15, 2019 “or to a time and date thereafter that is convenient for the Court.” (Declaration of Brian W. Ludeke, Exh. 2.) Having been a member of the California Bar for over forty years, it cannot come as a surprise to Plaintiff’s counsel that parties requesting a continuance are not likely to receive their requested trial date.

Plaintiff has given no reason that this case should receive priority over the other cases set for trial between now and September 2020. The fact that Plaintiff regrets agreeing to a continuance does not magically create an opening in the Court’s docket. Nor has Plaintiff “technically” attempted to argue that this case is entitled to preference based on CCP § 36, other than to argue that the interests of justice favor advancing the trial date. (Motion, at p. 4.)

Perhaps it is apt to remind Plaintiff of the saying “Be careful what you wish for, you may receive it.”[1]

The motion to advance the trial date is DENIED.

Moving party to give notice, unless waived.

IT IS SO ORDERED.

Dated: January 7, 2020 ___________________________________

Randolph M. Hammock

Judge of the Superior Court

Any party may submit on the tentative ruling by contacting the courtroom via email at Smcdept47@lacourt.org

[1] This saying may have first appeared in a classic horror story by W.W. Jacobs in Harper’s Monthly in 1902.