This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2023 at 19:34:57 (UTC).

ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY VS BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRA MORI. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6777

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES INC.

SWINERTON BUILDERS

Cross Defendants

CONCRETE COLLABORATIVE LLC

ROES 1-100 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAPALBO CHRISTOPHER JOHN

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LAWLESS KEVIN EARL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/30/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

3/30/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

2/24/2023: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

12/14/2022: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Settlement

11/23/2022: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

11/23/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Settlement

11/23/2022: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 11/23/2022

11/23/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 11/23/2022

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 11/03/2022

11/3/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 11/03/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

11/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Notice of Related Case

11/1/2022: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Personal Service

10/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

9/7/2022: Cross-Complaint

Answer

9/7/2022: Answer

Answer

8/26/2022: Answer

Answer

8/23/2022: Answer

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2023
  • Hearing06/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by Best Contracting Services, Inc. on 09/07/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Best Contracting Services, Inc. as to Concrete Collaborative, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Best Contracting Services, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); As to: Concrete Collaborative, LLC (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by Swinerton Builders on 08/23/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Swinerton Builders as to ROES 1-100, inclusive

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Swinerton Builders (Cross-Complainant); As to: ROES 1-100, inclusive (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Arch Insurance Company on 05/20/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Arch Insurance Company as to Best Contracting Services, Inc. and Swinerton Builders

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Arch Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Best Contracting Services, Inc. (Defendant); Swinerton Builders (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Arch Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 06/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Arch Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Arch Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Best Contracting Services, Inc. (Defendant); Swinerton Builders (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Arch Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Best Contracting Services, Inc. (Defendant); Swinerton Builders (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Arch Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Best Contracting Services, Inc. (Defendant); Swinerton Builders (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less