This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2022 at 22:05:38 (UTC).

ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY VS BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6777

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES INC.

SWINERTON BUILDERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAPALBO CHRISTOPHER JOHN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/20/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/20/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

5/20/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

5/20/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/20/2022: Complaint

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ACTION PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE SECTION 3853

6/14/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ACTION PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE SECTION 3853

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2024
  • Hearing05/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2023
  • Hearing11/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2023
  • Hearing11/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Action Pursuant to Labor Code Section 3853); Filed by Arch Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Arch Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Arch Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Arch Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SWINERTON BUILDERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAPALBO CHRISTOPHER JOHN