This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2020 at 16:34:16 (UTC).

ARBIB CONSTRUCTION INC VS SUSAN GENTER ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/01/2018 ARBIB CONSTRUCTION INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SUSAN GENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2193

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

ARBIB CONSTRUCTION INC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PIERRE VERONA LLC

GENTER SUSAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KLIER-ERLICH RINAT

Defendant Attorney

MAROOTIAN SHARICE B.

Cross Defendant Attorney

DECAMP CAMILLE J.

 

Court Documents

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

2/1/2018: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

2/16/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/16/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order -

4/4/2018: Minute Order -

SUMMONS -

2/1/2018: SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPLAINT RE SUSAN GENTER

4/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPLAINT RE SUSAN GENTER

Request for Dismissal

10/7/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

10/2/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

10/2/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

Notice of Settlement

8/12/2019: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;) OF 08/12/2019

8/12/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;) OF 08/12/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;)

8/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;)

Notice of Ruling

7/11/2019: Notice of Ruling

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE;) OF 06/25/2019

6/25/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE;) OF 06/25/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE;)

6/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE;)

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

5/8/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATES)

3/14/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATES)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION

3/14/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Arbib Construction, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Arbib Construction, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Susan Genter (Cross-Complainant); Pierre Verona, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Docketat 10:57 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: notice of settlement;) of 08/12/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; No Appearance) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-04-04 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

j ) I”Tj\i W

| Rinat Klier-Erlich (State Bar No. 188933) FIL rke@manningllp.com Superior Co ED L MANNING & KASS pC urt of California ELLROD, RAMIREZ, TRESTER LLP ountvaf¥.os Angeles 801 S. Figueroa St, 15" Floor APR 26 2018

Los Angeles, California 90017-3012

Telephone: (213) 624-6900 Sherri R. Carter, execunye - Facsimile: (213) 624-6999 By /;“‘j?yuerx of Court y Deputy '

Judi Lar Attorneys for Plaintiff ARBIB CONSTRUCTION, INC. udi Lara

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CENTRAL DISTRICT

ARBIB CONSTRUCTION, INC,, Case No. BC692193 D7Z/ f

Plaintiff, L

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

V. AND VERIFIED COMPLAINT RE , ~ PIERRE VERONA SUSAN GENTER, an individual and PIERRE VERONA, LLC and DOES 1 through 10, S Inclusive, Action Filed: February 1, 2018

Trial Date: | None Set

Defendants.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARBIB CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DECAMP CAMILLE JOY