This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/22/2020 at 10:18:26 (UTC).

ARBI ABRAMIAN, ET AL. VS ONESMUS TAYEBWA

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 ARBI ABRAMIAN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ONESMUS TAYEBWA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0933

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ABRAMIAN ARMELLA

ABRAMIAN ARBI

Defendant

TAYEBWA ONESMUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHOLNICK ROBERT M

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/24/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/24/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/24/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Dismissal

11/3/2020: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Arbi Abramian (Plaintiff); Armella Abramian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Arbi Abramian (Plaintiff); Armella Abramian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Arbi Abramian (Plaintiff); Armella Abramian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Arbi Abramian (Plaintiff); Armella Abramian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOLNICK ROBERT MARTIN