This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2022 at 22:23:02 (UTC).

ARAM PETROSYAN VS BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 ARAM PETROSYAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0467

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PETROSYAN ARAM

Defendants

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

FINCHEY CORPORATION OF CALIFORNIA DBA PACIFIC BMW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAVO NICHOLAS

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/28/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/28/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/28/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/28/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2022
  • Hearing11/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • Hearing09/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ARAM PETROSYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ARAM PETROSYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ARAM PETROSYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FINCHEY CORPORATION OF CA [BC554425] is a litigant

Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRAVO NICHOLAS