This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2023 at 19:44:00 (UTC).

VS SUNNY HILLS MANAGEMENT CO., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/18/2021 filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SUNNY HILLS MANAGEMENT CO ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL E. WHITAKER and AUDRA MORI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8258

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Defendants

HARBOR GATEWAY LLC

SUNNY HILLS MANAGEMENT CO.

VETERANS STAND TOGETHER

TRESTON SECURITY SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA COPRORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRAMER DANIEL KIPP

Defendant Attorneys

CRANERT TERRENCE L.

FOX DANA ALDEN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/3/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

3/30/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Notice of Change of Firm Name

2/10/2023: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

1/23/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

1/10/2023: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Answer

12/2/2022: Answer

Substitution of Attorney

11/16/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/8/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/12/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/4/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/8/2022: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Answer

5/17/2022: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT; [PROPOSED] ORDER

4/23/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

3/8/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

3/8/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

Answer

3/24/2022: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/30/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Substitution of Attorney

1/20/2022: Substitution of Attorney

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2024
  • Hearing10/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2024
  • Hearing01/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2024
  • Hearing01/03/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/03/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Final Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 04/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 01/03/2024 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 01/17/2024 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND [PROPOSED] ORDER; Signed and Filed by: Treston Security Services, Inc., a California Coproration (Defendant); Veterans Stand Together (Defendant); As to: (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by: Veterans Stand Together (Defendant); New Firm Name: MAVREDAKIS PHILLIPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: (Plaintiff); As to: Veterans Stand Together (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/26/2021; Service Cost: 112.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: (Plaintiff); As to: Sunny Hills Management Co. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/26/2021; Service Cost: 111.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 04/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: (Plaintiff); As to: Sunny Hills Management Co. (Defendant); Harbor Gateway, LLC (Defendant); Veterans Stand Together (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: (Plaintiff); As to: Sunny Hills Management Co. (Defendant); Harbor Gateway, LLC (Defendant); Veterans Stand Together (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (Plaintiff); As to: Sunny Hills Management Co. (Defendant); Harbor Gateway, LLC (Defendant); Veterans Stand Together (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
Please note that some of the information in this case has been redacted.