This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2021 at 18:14:35 (UTC).

ARAM ABGARYAN, ET AL. VS MALKIT SINGH

Case Summary

On 06/04/2020 ARAM ABGARYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MALKIT SINGH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1136

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ABGARYAN ARAM

ABGARYAN ZHENYA

Defendant

SINGH MALKIT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OURFALIAN SARKIS

Defendant Attorneys

STEVENS JEREMY

WILLIAMS CLAIRE ETTEMA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Aram Abgaryan (Plaintiff); Zhenya Abgaryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Malkit Singh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Malkit Singh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Malkit Singh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Aram Abgaryan (Plaintiff); Zhenya Abgaryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Aram Abgaryan (Plaintiff); Zhenya Abgaryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Aram Abgaryan (Plaintiff); Zhenya Abgaryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEVENS JEREMY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS CLAIRE ETTEMA